Work Experience
SL. No. | From Date | To Date | Employment | Practice | Area of Work | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Name & Address of Employer | Designation | Advocate / CA / CS / CMA | Name of Firm & Firm Registration Number, if applicable | ||||
1 | 30/12/2009 | 02/05/2021 | CA | (1) M B Gupta Co. Chartered Accounatnts upto June 1st 2019 , FRN 006928N (2) GRM Co , Chartered Accountants , TILL DATE ; FRN 030247C | Professional areas of a CA firm | ||
2 | 02/12/2002 | 30/11/2009 | Vintron Convergys Ltd | CEO and Director | Overall management as CEO | ||
3 | 01/07/1996 | 30/11/2002 | Vintron Informatics Ltd . Also had a prt time COP between 27.09.98 to 08.12.2000 in addition to employment . The period however counted as of employment only . | GM( Fin) and VP ( Fin Corp affrs) | Financial Management ,Corporate affairs | ||
4 | 06/08/1983 | 07/06/1996 | CA | (1) Rajan Garg and ; Associates (2) Vijay K Gupta and Associates (3) Gupta Garg Aggarwal , chartered accountatnts FRN 505762C | Finance Syndication , Corporate Governance ,Compliance , txation , audit etc |