Work Experience
SL. No. | From Date | To Date | Employment | Practice | Area of Work | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Name & Address of Employer | Designation | Advocate / CA / CS / CMA | Name of Firm & Firm Registration Number, if applicable | ||||
1 | 01/03/2018 | 31/05/2019 | Tatkal Loan India P Ltd-CEO | Business, Credit, Admin, Ops | |||
2 | 28/06/2012 | 15/01/2016 | Barclays Bank Plc-V.P. | Compliance | |||
3 | 15/04/2002 | 27/06/2012 | ICICI Bank Limited-Asst. General Manager | Credit and Compliance | |||
4 | 16/08/2000 | 12/04/2002 | Kotak Mahindra Primus Limited | Credit | |||
5 | 01/01/1999 | 15/08/2000 | Toyota Kirloskar Motor Pvt Ltd | Banking and Finance |