Work Experience
SL. No. | From Date | To Date | Employment | Practice | Area of Work | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Name & Address of Employer | Designation | Advocate / CA / CS / CMA | Name of Firm & Firm Registration Number, if applicable | ||||
1 | 05/09/1988 | 14/10/1990 | LOVELOCK & LEWES,ASST MANAGER | STATUTORY AUDIT,INTERNAL AUDIT,INVESTIGATIVE AUDIT | |||
2 | 15/10/1990 | 10/06/1991 | BENNET COLEMAN & CO LTD,AUDIT OFFICER | INTERNAL AUDIT | |||
3 | 24/06/1991 | 19/02/2008 | CROMPTON GREAVES LTD-SR MGR FIN | ACCOUNTS,FINANCE,TAXATION | |||
4 | 28/02/2008 | 26/12/2011 | MANAGER(FINANCE) | ACCOUNTS,FINANCE,TAXATION,IT | |||
5 | 23/06/2012 | 09/10/2012 | SIDD LIFE SCEINCES PVT LTD-FINANCE CONTROLLER | ACCOUNTS,FINANCE,INTERNAL AUDIT,IT | |||
6 | 10/10/2012 | 05/09/2014 | SICAGEN INDIA LTD-JOINT GENERAL MANAGER- FIN & ACCTS | ACCOUNTS,FINANCE,TAXATION | |||
7 | 08/09/2014 | 25/09/2015 | SAVA HEALTHCARE LTD,GENERAL MANAGER- FINANCE & ACCOUNTS | ACCOUNTS,FINANCE, COSTING,IT,TAXATION | |||
8 | 26/09/2015 | 22/11/2017 | NALCO CHAMPION DAI-ICHI INDIA LTD,HEAD- FINANCE | ACCOUNTS,FINANCE,IT,TAXATION |